Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAKEL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01651
Date Filed2020-07-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffANTONIO U. AKEL
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE O.P.R
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-01Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/1/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-011COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by ANTONIO U. AKEL. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Summons)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-012MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTONIO U. AKEL (adh, ) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-013PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTONIO U. AKEL (adh, ) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-074ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $39.16 from Prison Account of ANTONIO U. AKEL and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/7/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-08Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-085STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/8/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-136PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTONIO U. AKEL (ztd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2020: # 1 Statement) (ztd). (Entered: 07/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar