Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleContreras & Metelska, P.A. v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2020cv01551
Date Filed2020-07-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Patrick J. Schiltz
PlaintiffContreras & Metelska, P.A.
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Contreras & Metelska submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for Immigration Review for records. The law firm also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the law firm's request for a fee waiver. Contreras & Metelska filed an administrative appeal of the fee waiver denial. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Contreras & Metelska filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantExecutive Office for Immigration Review
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-101COMPLAINT against Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Department of Justice (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7871147) filed by Contreras & Metelska, P.A.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Ratkowski, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-102TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1551 (PJS/ECW). (MKB) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-103Summons Issued as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Department of Justice. (MKB) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-104SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Contreras & Metelska, P.A.. Executive Office for Immigration Review served on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; U.S. Department of Justice served on 7/10/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Ratkowski, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-215NOTICE of Appearance by David W Fuller on behalf of Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Department of Justice. (Fuller, David) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar