Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHINES v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01901
Date Filed2020-07-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPIERRE HINES
Case DescriptionPierre Hines, an attorney and community organizer, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prison for records concerning the award of a contract to CORE DC to operate a residential re-entry facility in Washington, DC. Hines also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted Hines' request for expedited processing. Six months later, BOP told Hines that it was withholding all 247 pages under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). Hines filed an administrative appeal and asked the agency to expedite the processing of the appeal. The agency told him it would not expedite the appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Hines filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 400) filed by PIERRE HINES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-14SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-17Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number: 4616003548. (ztd) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-242RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/20/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/19/2020. (ztd) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-07-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/23/2020 (ztd) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-07-313RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/23/20. (ztd) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar