Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTroise v. Flake et al
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityWichita Falls
Case Number7:2020cv00095
Date Filed2020-07-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reed C. O'Connor
PlaintiffRobert J Troise
Case DescriptionRobert Troise filed suit against Sara Flake, Allison Sullivan, Monica TaFoya, and Charles Rettis. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantShara Flake
DefendantAllsison Sullivan
DefendantMonica Tafova
DefendantCharles P Rettis
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-131COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Robert J Troise. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (skg) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-132New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ray (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-133Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (skg) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-134MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert J Troise (plp) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-14***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2, 3. Tue Jul 14 11:07:34 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-215ORDER: It is therefore ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must pay to the clerk of Court the full filing fee of $400.00 by August 20, 2020. If he fails to do so, denial of leave to proceed in forma pauperis will be recommended, and this case will be subject to dismissal without prejudice as provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 7/21/2020) (skg) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-21***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Jul 21 10:10:43 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar