Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLOS PADRES FORESTWATCH v. U.S. FOREST SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01911
Date Filed2020-07-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffLOS PADRES FORESTWATCH
Case DescriptionLos Padres ForestWatch submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Forest Service for records concerning a special use permit granted to Parks Management Company to manage recreation throughout the Los Padres National Forest. Los Padres ForestWatch also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged the receipt of the request, told Los Padres ForestWatch that the request had been sent to the Pacific Northwest Region, and indicated that it would not charge search fees because it could not respond within 20 days. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Los Padres ForestWatch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOREST SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-151COMPLAINT against U.S. FOREST SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7341589) filed by LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Summons Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Summons U.S. Forest Service)(Kane, Maya) Modified on 7/15/2020 to correct filer.(ztnr) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/21/2020) (znmw). (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH (Kane, Maya) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-153ERRATA by LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH 1 Complaint, filed by LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Signed Civil Cover Sheet)(Kane, Maya) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-15Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-154SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FOREST SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FOREST SERVICE served on 7/27/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Kane, Maya) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/29/2020) (zjf). (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/27/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Kane, Maya) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/29/2020) (zjf). (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/27/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/26/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Kane, Maya) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/29/2020) (zjf). (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-308STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/30/20. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar