Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRyan, LLC v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityHouston
Case Number4:2020cv02488
Date Filed2020-07-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Alfred H Bennett
PlaintiffRyan, LLC
Case DescriptionRyan LLC, a global tax services and software provider, was notified that potentially confidential business information was part of a FOIA request submitted for a specific report prepared by the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Interior. Ryan then submitted a FOIA request to the agency for the revised OIG report. The agency provided a copy of the report, but after the agency refused to redact the report in line with Ryan's suggestions, Ryan filed a reverse-FOIA suit to block disclosure.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Reverse-FOIA - Confidential business information, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of the Interior
DefendantOffice of Inspector General of the U.S. Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-151COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24930772) filed by Ryan, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-152Request for Issuance of Summons as to U.S. Department of the Interior, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-153Request for Issuance of Summons as to U.S. Department of the Interior, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-154Request for Issuance of Summons as to Office of Inspector General of the U.S. Department of the Interior, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-155Request for Issuance of Summons as to Office of Inspector General of the U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Interior, Asst. Attorney General for Administration - U.S. Dept. of Justice - Justice Management Div., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-156Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ryan, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matt Travis, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-167ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-168Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Complaint)(ChristopherSarrat, 4) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-169NOTICE of Withdrawal of Docket No. 6 re: 6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ryan, LLC, filed. (Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-2810CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ryan, LLC, filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-2811NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Collins on behalf of Ryan, LLC, filed. (Collins, Kevin) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar