Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01917
Date Filed2020-07-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State, the General Services Administration, the Army, and the Navy for records concerning communications related to allowing Secretary Michael Pompeo to use military housing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing anything further from any of the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. ARMY
DefendantU.S. NAVY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-161COMPLAINT against U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7346764) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-16Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-163SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/20/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/19/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/20/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ARMY served on 7/20/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/20/2020; U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 7/20/2020; U.S. NAVY served on 7/20/2020 (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-08-195Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. NAVY (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-20MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 5 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Upon consideration of Defendants' Motion, it is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc and for good cause shown, that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by September 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/20/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-09-026ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. NAVY.(Truong, John) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-08MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/8/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 10/9/2020. (zkh) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar