Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01939
Date Filed2020-07-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffSTARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING
Case DescriptionStark Link Engineering Equipment Trading submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning Customs Case No. 2019-5201-000352-01. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Stark that it needed to provide a third-party authorization before it would process the request. Stark provided third-party authorization but when Stark heard nothing further from the agency, it filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further Stark filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU S Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-171COMPLAINT against U S Customs and Border Protection ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7356145) filed by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING.(Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-172CIVIL COVER SHEET by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING filed by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING.(Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-193REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 07/19/2020)
2020-07-194REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 07/19/2020)
2020-07-195REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 07/19/2020)
2020-07-206ERRATA by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-21Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-227SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-288GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/28/2020. (jag) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-08-059RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General July 30, 2020. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 08/05/2020)
2020-08-0510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 7/31/2020 (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 08/05/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar