Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleScandling v. United States Department of Labor
DistrictNorthern District of Ohio
CityCleveland
Case Number1:2020cv01585
Date Filed2020-07-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James S. Gwin
PlaintiffJonathan Scandling
Case DescriptionJonathan Scandling submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning training of Wage and Hour Division investigators regarding the Fair Labor Relations Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked for an extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Scandling filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Labor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-171Complaint against United States Department of Labor. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10114096.. Filed by Jonathan Scandling. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Email dated 12-18-2019, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Email dated 12-19-2019, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Email dated 1-28-2020, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Email dated 2-10-2020, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Email dated 2-10-2020, # 6 Summons U.S. Dept of Labor, # 7 Summons U.S. Atty General, # 8 Summons Atty for OHND, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bumpass, T.) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-20Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-20Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-202Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon United States Department of Labor, U.S. Attorney General, United States Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-21Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to United States Department of Labor Receipt # 70100780000177934455, U.S. Attorney General Receipt # 70100780000177934448 and the U.S. Attorney Receipt # 70100780000178272495 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (S,SR) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-273Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon United States Department of Labor through the U.S. Attorney on 7/23/2020 filed on behalf of Jonathan Scandling. Related document(s) 2 . (L,Br) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-294Joint Attorney Appearance Notice by Sara E. DeCaro filed by on behalf of United States Department of Labor. Related document(s) 1 .(DeCaro, Sara) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar