Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCarmody et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv04809
Date Filed2020-07-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffBryan Carmody
PlaintiffFirst Amendment Coalition
Case DescriptionBryan Carmody, a freelance journalist, and the First Amendment Coalition submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning a police raid at Carmody's home that included several FBI agents. Carmody also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The FBI denied the request on the basis of Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Carmody and FAC filed an administrative appeal. The agency denied the appeal. Carmody and FAC then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-171COMPLAINT for violation of FOIA against Federal Bureau of Investigation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14706605.). Filed byBryan Carmody. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tagharobi, Sherene) (Filed on 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-202Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-203Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-234Certificate of Interested Entities by Bryan Carmody, First Amendment Coalition (Tagharobi, Sherene) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-245CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bryan Carmody, First Amendment Coalition.. (Tagharobi, Sherene) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-246Proposed Summons. (Tagharobi, Sherene) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-247Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-298CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryan Carmody, First Amendment Coalition (Tagharobi, Sherene) (Filed on 7/29/2020) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-07-299CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-08-1410CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Bureau of Investigation.. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-1911STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-09-2512CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 9:30 AM is reset to 10:30 AM .This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/202 0) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-2913NOTICE of Appearance by Sherene Tagharobi for Attorney Glen Smith (Tagharobi, Sherene) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-3014ANSWER to Complaint byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-0115ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Carmody and FAC (Tagharobi, Sherene) (Filed on 10/1/2020) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-0216ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-1517JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-2218Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 10/22/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2021. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Glen Smith and Sherene Tagharobi. Defendant's Attorney: Benjamin Wolinsky. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-12-2819CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons gran ted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar