Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleANDERSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01860
Date Filed2020-07-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffMELVIN ANDERSON
DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-07Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/07/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by MELVIN ANDERSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(zsb) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-072MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MELVIN ANDERSON (zsb) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-073PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by MELVIN ANDERSON (zsb) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-244ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $0 from Prison Account of MELVIN ANDERSON and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/24/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-27Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-08-055SUMMONS (2) Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshals Service. (zsb) (Entered: 08/05/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar