Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCobble v. Georgia Attorney General et al
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2020cv02929
Date Filed2020-07-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael L. Brown
PlaintiffDaniel Eric Cobble
Case DescriptionDaniel Cobble filed suit against the Georgia Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney General for mistreatment. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantGeorgia Attorney General
DefendantU. S. Attorney General
DefendantTennessee Attorney General
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-131COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Eric Cobble. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -Letter, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-152FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-15Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Daniel Eric Cobble re 2 Order. (eop) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-15Submission of 1 Complaint for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-233FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint, filed by Daniel Eric Cobble. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to withdraw the reference to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 7/23/20. (bjh) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-234ORDER for Service of 3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 7/23/20. (bjh) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-23Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Daniel Eric Cobble re 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint, 4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (bjh) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-08-045SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 08/04/2020)
2020-08-04Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Daniel Eric Cobble re 5 Notice (Other). (bjh) (Entered: 08/04/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar