Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGalliani et al v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2020cv04863
Date Filed2020-07-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffRaymond Galliani
PlaintiffSharon Galliani
Case DescriptionRaymond and Sharon Galliani submitted a FOIA request through their attorneys to the IRS for records concerning their tax records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Gallianis filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-201COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Internal Revenue Service ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14713060.). Filed byRaymond Galliani, Sharon Galliani. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koodrich, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-202Proposed Summons. (Koodrich, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-203Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-214Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-215Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-216Certificate of Interested Entities by Raymond Galliani, Sharon Galliani (Koodrich, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/21/2020) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-217AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Other New Case Documents by Certified Mail served on Internal Revenue Service and Attorney General of the United States on July 21, 2020, filed by Raymond Galliani, Sharon Galliani. (Koodrich, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/21/2020) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-238AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Other New Case Documents by Personal Service served on Wendy Garbers on July 21, 2020, filed by Raymond Galliani, Sharon Galliani. (Koodrich, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar