Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01947
Date Filed2020-07-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the FBI and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning a January 5, 2017 White House meeting with then President Obama and Vice President Biden that included the FBI and ONDI. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantOFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-201COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7359655) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Dep't of Justice, # 3 Summons Office of Director of Nat'l Intelligence, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-21Case assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-213SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-08-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/31/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/30/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2020)
2020-08-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/31/20. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2020)
2020-08-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/31/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2020)
2020-08-027RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 7/31/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar