Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01948
Date Filed2020-07-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to National Railroad Passenger Corporation for records concerning Amtrak's implementation and use of mandatory mediation clauses for passengers. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
doing business as AMTRAK
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-201COMPLAINT against NATIONAL PASSENGER RAILROAD CORPORATION d/b/a AMTRAK ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7360076) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Amtrak Summons, # 3 Summons US Atty Summons, # 4 Summons AG Summons)(Joshi, Nandan) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Joshi, Nandan) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-21Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-213SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL PASSENGER RAILROAD CORPORATION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-214STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 21, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar