Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01959
Date Filed2020-07-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning the agency's directive to the North Cascades National Park to stop work on its environmental impact statement regarding grizzly bear recovery. The agency acknowledged of the request. However, after waiting more than 13 months for a response, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-211COMPLAINT by Center for Biological Diversity against All Plaintiffs v. Deparatment of the Interior ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7364013) filed by William CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Rule 26 Disclosure, # 3 Summons Interior, # 4 Summons AG/Justice, # 5 Summons US Atty/DC, # 6 PHV motion, # 7 PHV Declaration, # 8 PHV Proposed Order)(Snape, William) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (adh, ) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-22Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-233SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar