Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP et al v. UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA)
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01983
Date Filed2020-07-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
PlaintiffSPARACINO PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher submitted eight FOIA requests to U.S. Central Command for records concerning the deaths or injuries of their clients in Iraq. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Willkie Farr & Gallagher filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-211COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7367945) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP, SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 EXHIBIT 1 - FOIA Request, # 4 EXHIBIT 2 - FOIA Request, # 5 EXHIBIT 3 - FOIA Request, # 6 EXHIBIT 4 - Closure Letter, # 7 EXHIBIT 5 - Additional Requests)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-22Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-233SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA). (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-284REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP, SPARACINO PLLC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP, SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-295SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ztth) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar