Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02007
Date Filed2020-07-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe White Coat Waste Project submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning named staffers in the Center for Drug Evaluation and Research pertaining to attempts by Vanda Pharmaceuticals to avoid the agency's testing requirements for using dogs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the White Coat Waste Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7374095) filed by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-23Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-233SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-234ERRATA re 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES filed by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT.(Strugar, Matthew) Modified on 7/23/2020 to correct docket event/text (zjf). (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-305STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/30/20. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar