Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02010
Date Filed2020-07-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning schools under investigation for accepting foreign gifts over $250,000 in violation of Section 117 of the Higher Education Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-231COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7376687) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Education, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-23Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-233SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-08-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/31/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/30/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2020)
2020-08-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/31/20. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2020)
2020-08-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 7/30/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar