Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02024
Date Filed2020-07-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted five FOIA requests to the National Park Service for records concerning the installation of communication equipment in five different parks. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the requests, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-231COMPLAINT against NATIONAL PARK SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7379877) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Declaration 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure, # 3 Summons Attorney General Summons, # 4 Summons Agency Summons, # 5 Summons USAO summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (zsb) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-24Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar