Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Department Of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv05739
Date Filed2020-07-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Valerie E. Caproni
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning emails to or from the White House mentioning Omarosa Newman, who had worked in the White House before being terminated. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed six pages but withheld 41 pages entirely under Exemption 5 (privileges) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). The New York Times submitted an administrative appeal. The agency upheld its original decision. The New York Times then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-231COMPLAINT against Department Of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20820712)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-232CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-233RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Financiero Inbursa for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-234REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-24CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-24Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-24Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-245ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Justice..(jgo) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-27NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar