Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHARRINGTON v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02054
Date Filed2020-07-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffKOHL HARRINGTON
Case DescriptionKohl Harrington, a documentary filmmaker, submitted FOIA requests to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning communications from several staffers at the Office of Government Information Services concerning his complaints to OGIS. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Harrington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-281COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7395152) filed by KOHL HARRINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11-20, # 3 Exhibit 21-30, # 4 Exhibit 31-41, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-282NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of KOHL HARRINGTON (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-283NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of KOHL HARRINGTON (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-29Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-07-304SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-08-035ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/03/2020. (DM) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-09-086NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-087ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-258RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/7/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-259RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/7/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/6/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-10-01MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint status report to address initial progress in this action by or before OCTOBER 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 1, 2020. (lcckk1) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2020. (dot) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-1510Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 10 Joint Status Report. The parties shall file another joint status report by or before January 15, 2021, to update the Court on Defendant's processing of Plaintiff's FOIA requests. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 15, 2020. (lcckk1) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2021. (dot) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2021-01-1511Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-18MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 11 Joint Status Report. As proposed therein, the parties shall submit another joint status report by or before April 15, 2021. The parties shall then submit periodic joint status reports every 60 days thereafter until further order from the Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 18, 2021. (lcckk1) (Entered: 01/18/2021)
2021-01-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2021, and every 60 days thereafter until further order from the Court. (dot) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar