Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWheeler v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictDistrict of New Mexico
CityLas Cruces
Case Number2:2020cv00788
Date Filed2020-08-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea
PlaintiffJohn D. Wheeler
Case DescriptionJohn Wheeler submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning a dog named Lesko stationed at the Canine Center El Paso. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. However, it assigned three different tracking numbers. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wheeler filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [6]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-061COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by John D. Wheeler. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Wheeler, John) (Entered: 08/06/2020)
2020-08-06United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr) (Entered: 08/06/2020)
2020-08-062PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (dr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)
2020-08-063Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number ANMDC-7244917 (dr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)
2020-08-06Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (dr) (Entered: 08/06/2020)
2020-08-07United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (dr) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-08-074PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-11-035ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Homeland Security. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by John D. Wheeler.(Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-046INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 12/8/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 12/15/2020 at 01:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/25/2020. (ke) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar