Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02172
Date Filed2020-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the Per and Polyfluoralkyl Substances national plan. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked PEER for several extensions of time in which to respond. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-091COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7441364) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration 26.1 statement, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 3 Summons Agency Summons, # 4 Summons AG Summons, # 5 Summons USAO summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 08/09/2020)
2020-08-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (adh, ) Modified filer on 8/11/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-10Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-09-164NOTICE of Appearance by John Cuong Truong on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Truong, John) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar