Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAna Muniz v. The United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2020cv07153
Date Filed2020-08-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dale S. Fischer
PlaintiffAna Muniz
Case DescriptionAna Muniz, an assistant professor of criminology at the University of California-Irvine, whose research specializes in immigrant gangs, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service for records concerning the number of individuals for whom U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement has received criminal history information from foreign partners under the Criminal History Sharing Program. Muniz's FOIA request was referred to ICE for response. ICE acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Muniz filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantThe United States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-101COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27557016 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Attorney Matthew D Strugar added to party Ana Muniz(pty:pla))(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-102CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-103Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-104NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ana Muniz, identifying n/a. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-115NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-116NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-117[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 8/12/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 9] 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security. (ghap) Modified on 8/12/2020 (ghap). (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-118STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-129NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Request 3 . Document # 3 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk issued #3 the 30 Day Summons in error. The attorney did not put the defendant name. (ghap) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-1210NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 3 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. Please put Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-1211Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-1212[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 8/12/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 14] 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security. (ghap) Modified on 8/12/2020 (ghap). (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-121330 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security. (ghap) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-1214NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 12 . Document # 12 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk docketed issued the 60 Day Summons in error. The correct day is 30 Day. (ghap) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-1315Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-1316Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-131730 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to United States Attorney General. (et) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-131830 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security for Civil Process Clerk US Attorney's Office. (et) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-09-0219STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The United States Department of Homeland Security answer now due 10/13/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security.(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party The United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar