Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOLDWATER INSTITUTE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02194
Date Filed2020-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffGOLDWATER INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Goldwater Institute submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning the agency's review of EA submissions from major institutions. The Goldwater Institute also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency estimated the Goldwater Institute's request would take seven months to complete. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Goldwater Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-111COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7449261) filed by GOLDWATER INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons)(Levitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GOLDWATER INSTITUTE (Levitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-123ERRATA by GOLDWATER INSTITUTE 1 Complaint, filed by GOLDWATER INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Levitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-13Case assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmc) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-134STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/13/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-135SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-09-016ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT re 1 Complaint, Proof of Service by GOLDWATER INSTITUTE. (Levitt, Jonathan) Modified on 9/3/2020 (eg). (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-03NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 6 Affidavit was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using correct event. (eg) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-097RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/24/2020 (Levitt, Jonathan) Modified party served on 9/9/2020 (eg). (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-09-138NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/13/2020)
2020-09-149ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE UNITED STATES served on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020; U.S. ATTORNEY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA served on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE UNITED STATES served on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020; U.S. ATTORNEY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA served on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020 (Levitt, Jonathan) Modified on 9/14/2020 (zjf). (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-14NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 9 Summons Returned Executed as to foreign state or agency, Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (zjf) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-1410ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/21/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/24/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/20/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/19/2020.) (Levitt, Jonathan) Modified on 9/14/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-14NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 10 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant,,, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General,,, Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney,, was entered in error per counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (ztd) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-1411RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/24/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/3/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/3/2020.) (Levitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-1812ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar