Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02195
Date Filed2020-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of Defense for records concerning actions taken under the Defense Production Act to reroute or reprioritize specific shipments of emergency supplies during the pandemic. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The Federal Emergency Management Agency granted American Oversight's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantFEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-111COMPLAINT against FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7449370) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (USAO), # 3 Summons (AG), # 4 Summons (DHS), # 5 Summons (FEMA), # 6 Summons (DOD))(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-11Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-113SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-134MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Megan C. Field, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7458755. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Megan C. Field, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-13MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit the following link: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/13/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-185NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Field on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Field, Megan) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-08-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/17/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/16/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/17/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY served on 8/17/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 8/17/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/24/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Olivia I. Bravo)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
2020-09-027NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Megan Field terminated. (Field, Megan) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-138NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/13/2020)
2020-09-149Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-15MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before September 30, 2020. The parties shall meet and confer prior to October 14, 2020, and submit a Joint Status Report on October 14, 2020, updating the Court on the current status of Plaintiffs FOIA requests. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/15/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/14/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar