Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOLCHIN v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02201
Date Filed2020-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffROBERT J. TOLCHIN, ESQ.
Case DescriptionRobert Tolchin, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Foreign Assets Control, part of the Department of Treasury, for records concerning funds forfeited to the U.S. from actions taken in doing business with a state sponsor of terrorism. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. OFAC told Tolchin that it could not respond in a timely manner. Tolchin then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantOFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7450116) filed by ROBERT J. TOLCHIN, ESQ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Treasury acknowledgment of FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - 6-29-18 email, # 3 Exhibit C - OFAC acknowlegment, # 4 Exhibit D - 9-12-18 email, # 5 Exhibit E - 11-1-18 email, # 6 Exhibit F - 6-12-20 email, # 7 Exhibit G - USVSST Fund 2020 report to Congress, # 8 Exhibit H - USVSST website, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons)(Tolchin, Robert) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-12Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-122SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-133STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 13, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-09-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 8/18/2020; OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL served on 8/18/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/18/2020. (Tolchin, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-175ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL.(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar