Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02212
Date Filed2020-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the agency's proposed rulemaking on streamlining the process for permit appeals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked PEER to clarify the scope of its request. After the agency told PEER that it would take several more weeks before it could begin working on its request, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-111COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7451016) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Declaration 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure, # 3 Summons Agency Summons, # 4 Summons AG Summons, # 5 Summons USAO summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-12Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-144REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE correcting error in previously submitted summons re 1 Complaint, filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY.(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-165SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (zjf) (Entered: 08/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar