Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL COUNCIL FOR ADOPTION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02217
Date Filed2020-08-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffNATIONAL COUNCIL FOR ADOPTION
Case DescriptionThe National Council for Adoption submitted ten FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's relationship with the Intercountry Adoption Accreditation and Maintenance Entity and its selection as the accrediting entity for adoption providers. NCA also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency denied NCA's request for expedited processing and deferred a decision of NCA's fee waiver request. NCA filed an administrative appeal of the agency's denial of its expedited processing request. The agency upheld its original denial. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, NCA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-121COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7454905) filed by NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR ADOPTION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-12Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-123STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/12/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-244NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 08/24/2020)
2020-08-315RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/13/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/12/2020. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-316RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/18/2020. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-317RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/31/2020 (Wolverton, Caroline) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-09-148ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-14MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before October 5, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/14/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar