Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePHILLIPS v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02233
Date Filed2020-08-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJOSHUA PHILLIPS
Case DescriptionJoshua Phillips, a freelance journalist, submitted three FOIA requests to OMB for records concerning training on how to respond to a pandemic. Phillips also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. Phillips also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning negligent death complaints made to the agency because of corona virus. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. However, after hearing nothing further from the either agency pertaining to any of his requests, Phillips filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantTHE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-131COMPLAINT against THE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7461615) filed by JOSHUA PHILLIPS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, # 2 Exhibit 6-10, # 3 Exhibit 11-12, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-132NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of JOSHUA PHILLIPS (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-133NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JOSHUA PHILLIPS (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-14Case assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmc) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-144SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-09-285NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-09-286ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-09-307ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before October 28, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/30/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 8/31/2020 (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-129RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 9/3/2020 (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-1210RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/27/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-1211RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/27/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/26/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-2812STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-11-13MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit joint status reports to the Court every sixty (60) days until document productions are complete. The first joint status report must be submitted by December 15, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/13/2020. (lcabj1) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-12-1513Joint STATUS REPORT by JOSHUA PHILLIPS. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-16MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit a joint status report by February 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/16/2020. (lcabj1) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar