Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02238
Date Filed2020-08-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Agency for International Development for records concerning calendars and emails for senior officials. The agency acknowledged the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-141COMPLAINT against U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7465126) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to USAID)(Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-14Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-08-174STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/17/2020. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-09-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/20/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/19/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/27/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT served on 8/24/2020 (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-136NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/13/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar