Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILSON et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02190
Date Filed2020-08-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffSCOTT WILSON in his capacity us Utah Federal Public Defender
PlaintiffKATHRYN NESTER in her capacity as prior Utah Federal Public Defender
Case DescriptionScott Wilson and Kathyrn Nester, both attorneys for the Utah Federal Public Defender's Office, submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning two prisoners, Danny Fortner and David Paul Wengler. Wilson provided privacy waivers from both Fortner and Wengler. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency did not respond to the request on Fortner but provided 363 pages of records in response to the Wengler request. The majority of the disclosed records contained redactions. Wilson filed an administrative appeal of the redactions. The Office of Information Policy declined to process the appeal because the case was now subject to litigation. Wilson then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-04Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/4/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-041COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS filed by SCOTT WILSON, KATHRYN NESTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-042MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KATHRYN NESTER, SCOTT WILSON. (zmd) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-043NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Nathan Phelps on behalf of KATHRYN NESTER, SCOTT WILSON. (zmd) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-11MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the application to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall assign this case randomly to a judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/11/20. (psu2) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-12Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-12MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Clerks Office shall direct the USMS to effect prompt service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/12/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-09-034SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshals Service (zsb) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar