Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMAYS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02197
Date Filed2020-08-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffJOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS
Case DescriptionJoseph Mays, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning his treatment at FCI Butner. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Mays filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantOFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY U.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-10Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/10/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-101COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY filed by JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS.(zsb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-102MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS (zsb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-103MOTION to Compel by JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS (zsb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-124PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/12/2020. (zsb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-09-035MOTION for Extension of Time to File by JOSEPH RANDOLPH MAYS (zsb) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar