Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAST v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02202
Date Filed2020-08-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffJOHN RAYMOND AST
Case DescriptionJohn Ast, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning his treatment while in prison. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Ast filed suit.

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantM.D. CARVAJAL Director of the Federal Bureau of Prisons Central Office
DefendantLEXISNEXIS GROUP
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-04Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/4/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-041COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, LEXISNEXIS GROUP, M.D. CARVAJAL filed by JOHN RAYMOND AST. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Memorandum in Support)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-042MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOHN RAYMOND AST (adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-043PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by JOHN RAYMOND AST (adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-044Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by JOHN RAYMOND AST.. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-175PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/12/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar