Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02256
Date Filed2020-08-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning the agency's role in selecting Louis DeJoy as head of the Postal Service. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told CREW that based on a limited search, the agency was providing three documents responsive to CREW's request. After hearing nothing further from the agency CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantU.S. POSTAL SERVICE
DefendantU.S. POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7471911) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Dep't of Treasury, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-08-17Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmd) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-08-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY., SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons #2, # 2 Summons #3, # 3 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-08-203NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Nikhel Sus on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON Substituting for attorney Anne L. Weismann (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-204LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-275ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/27/2020. (DM) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
2020-09-026AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. Postal Service, # 2 Summons U.S. Postal Service Office of Inspector General)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-037RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 8/25/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/25/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/25/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/24/2020.) (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-228SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(ztd) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar