Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of Washington v. Office of Management and Budget
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv01231
Date Filed2020-08-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert S. Lasnik
PlaintiffState of Washington
Case DescriptionThe Attorney General of the State of Washington submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning the government's decision to close the Seattle National Archives facility and move the records to Kansas City and Riverdale, California. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Attorney General filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOffice of Management and Budget an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-171COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Office of Management and Budget (Receipt # AWAWDC-6534628) Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-08-18Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-08-182Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Office of Management and Budget. (RE) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-08-193AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Office of Management and Budget on 8/18/2020, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-09-164NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendant Office of Management and Budget. (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-175ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Office of Management and Budget.(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar