Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of Washington v. United States National Archives and Records Administration
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv01232
Date Filed2020-08-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert S. Lasnik
PlaintiffState of Washington
Case DescriptionThe Attorney General of the State of Washington submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning the decision to sell the National Archives facility in Seattle. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Attorney General filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States National Archives and Records Administration an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [6]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-171COMPLAINT against defendant(s) U.S. National Archives and Records Administration (Receipt # AWAWDC-6534685) Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-08-18Judge Richard A. Jones added. (RE) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-08-182Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration. (RE) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-08-193***VACATED per 6 Order*** STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) Modified on 8/21/2020 (LH). (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-194MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik for all further proceedings because it is related to Case No. CV 20-1231RSL. Judge Richard A. Jones no longer assigned to case. All pleadings filed in the future shall bear case numbers CV 20-1232 RSL. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-195AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States National Archives and Records Administration on 8/18/2020, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-216ORDER VACATING ORDER: The Standing Order at Dkt. # 3 is hereby VACATED. Counsel are reminded to familiarize themselves with the Federal rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rules of the Western District of Washington and the District's Electronic Filing Procedures. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 08/21/2020)
2020-09-167NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration. (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-178ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States National Archives and Records Administration.(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar