Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of Washington v. United States General Services Administration
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv01233
Date Filed2020-08-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert S. Lasnik
PlaintiffState of Washington
Case DescriptionThe Attorney General of the State of Washington submitted a FOIA request to the General Services Administration for records concerning the decision to sell the Seattle National Archives facility. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Attorney General filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States General Services Administration an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-171COMPLAINT against defendant(s) U.S. General Services Administration (Receipt # AWAWDC-6534710) Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-08-18Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (RE) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-08-182Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States General Services Administration. (RE) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-08-193MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case, related to C20-1231-RSL, reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas S. Zilly no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C20-1233-RSL. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-194AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States General Services Administration on 8/18/2020, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-09-165NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendant United States General Services Administration. (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-176ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States General Services Administration.(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar