Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCentro Legal de la Raza v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv05839
Date Filed2020-08-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffCentro Legal de la Raza
Case DescriptionCentro Legal de la Raza submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning the agency's role in administrating the Institutional Hearing Program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed 39 redacted pages. CLR filed an administrative appeal of the agency's redactions. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CLR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Prisons
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-191COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act against Federal Bureau of Prisons ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14834577.). Filed byCentro Legal de la Raza. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment)(Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-192Proposed Summons. (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-193Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-194Certificate of Interested Entities by Centro Legal de la Raza (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-195CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Centro Legal de la Raza.. (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-206Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-207Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Prisons, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-218CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)
2020-08-219CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Centro Legal de la Raza (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)
2020-09-2110NOTICE of Appearance by John Wesley Samples (Samples, John) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-2111STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Samples, John) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-2112CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2020 . (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar