Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02283
Date Filed2020-08-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Interior. DFF's first FOIA request asked for records concerning areas protected by the Coastal Barrier Resources Act. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told DFF that it had located 21 responsive emails and 114 responsive pages. DFF's second FOIA request asked for records on CBRA-protected areas from the Fish and Wildlife Service. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency did not acknowledge the second request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7482825) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Annatoyn, Travis) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Annatoyn, Travis) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-20Case assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmc) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-204STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/20/20. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit1) (mac) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/27/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/27/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/26/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 8/26/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Annatoyn, Travis) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar