Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02288
Date Filed2020-08-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State and the Department of Defense for records concerning the use of chemicals during the Syrian Civil War. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from either agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-191COMPLAINT against All Defendants (US Department of State and US Department of Defense) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7484041) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for US State Department, # 5 Summons for US Department of Defense)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-193NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-00694-KBJ. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-20Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-204SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-205GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/20/2020. (jag) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-09-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/31/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/30/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 09/05/2020)
2020-09-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/31/20. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 09/05/2020)
2020-09-058RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/31/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 09/05/2020)
2020-09-059RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 8/31/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 09/05/2020)
2020-09-1510NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of All Defendants (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar