Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOPEN THE GOVERNMENT et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02290
Date Filed2020-08-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffOPEN THE GOVERNMENT
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionOpen the Government submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Disease Control for records concerning communications between the agency, the White House, and senior Health and Human Services officials concerning policies related to the corona virus. Open the Government also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Open the Government that it would be unable to respond within the time limits. The agency also asked Open the Government to narrow the scope of its request. Open the Government narrowed the scope of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Open the Government filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantCENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-191COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7484764) filed by OPEN THE GOVERNMENT, GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-J, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-192NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT, OPEN THE GOVERNMENT (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-193NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT, OPEN THE GOVERNMENT (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-20Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-204SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-09-175NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar