Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTeo v. United States Internal Revenue Service
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityWest Palm Beach
Case Number9:2020cv81351
Date Filed2020-08-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Donald M. Middlebrooks
PlaintiffAlfred S.K. Teo
Case DescriptionAlfred Teo submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the file for Agent Jamie Roberts. Although the agency apparently told Teo's attorney that it would release Roberts' file, the agency ultimately told Teo to submit a FOIA request. Teo did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency Teo filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Internal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-191COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13377569, filed by Alfred S.K. Teo. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(Stern, Samuel) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-192Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-203NOTICE by Alfred S.K. Teo Proposed Summons (Stern, Samuel) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-204Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summonses cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Multiple parties added to one summons. The filer is instructed to re-file a proposed summonses for each party. (ail) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-205NOTICE by Alfred S.K. Teo Amended Proposed Summons (Stern, Samuel) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-216Summons Issued as to United States Internal Revenue Service. (ail) (Entered: 08/21/2020)
2020-09-227ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/7/2021 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar