Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWood v. United States Air Force
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityAustin
Case Number1:2020cv00870
Date Filed2020-08-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert Pitman
PlaintiffJames Dante Wood
Case DescriptionJames Wood submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Air Force for records concerning two SR-71 fly-overs of Polly Klaas' house in Petaluma, California. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wood filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Air Force
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-191COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400 is DUE.), filed by James Dante Wood. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet and Envelope)(cj) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-19Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-19CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (cj) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-192Case Opening Letter mailed to James Dante Wood. (cj) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-193ORDER that Plaintiff, within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order, must submit either the filing fee of $400.00 or a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (cj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: # 1 IFP) (cj). (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-264MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Dante Wood.. Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (dl) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar