Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDKINS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02342
Date Filed2020-08-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJOSEPH B. JUDKINS
Case DescriptionJoseph Judkins, an attorney at the law firm of Baker & McKenzie, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning an August 2018 Federal Resister notice regarding proposed regulations under IRC Section 965. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided an interim response consisting of 495 pages. The agency withheld 243 pages under Exemption 2 (internal practices and procedures). However, after receiving that interim response, Judkins heard nothing further from agency. Judkins then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantTREASURY DEPARTMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-251COMPLAINT against TREASURY DEPARTMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7505085) filed by JOSEPH JUDKINS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-25Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to TREASURY DEPARTMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-253ERRATA by JOSEPH JUDKINS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-09-034Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-04MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file an answer or responsive pleading by October 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/4/2020. (lccrc1) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-04NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer; emailed to nishant.kumar@usdoj.gov, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. DO NOT REFILE. FYI for future filings. Please make sure the the information on your filings are correct like ie. case number See Order. (ztd, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar