Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDKINS v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02344
Date Filed2020-08-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJOSEPH B. JUDKINS
Case DescriptionJoseph Judkins, an attorney at the law firm of Baker & McKenzie, submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning an August 2018 Federal Register notice regarding regulations under IRC Section 965. The IRS acknowledged receipt of the request. The IRS gave Judkins a fee estimate, which he paid. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judkins filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-251COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7505407) filed by JOSEPH JUDKINS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-25Case assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-262SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-09-033Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-03MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/3/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-03Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 11/2/2020. (jth) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar