Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC v. WOLF et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02348
Date Filed2020-08-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffLOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC
Case DescriptionThe Louise Trauma Center submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning training materials for staff working on asylum and other removal operations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Louise Trauma Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCHAD F. WOLF Acting Secretary, DHS
DefendantCHAD F. WOLF
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Acting Secretary, DHS
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-251COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7505600) filed by LOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-252CIVIL COVER SHEET by LOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC re 1 Complaint filed by LOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by LOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-25Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-253SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD F. WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-254STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 25, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/26/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/25/2020. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/28/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 08/29/2020)
2020-08-297ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHAD F. WOLF served on 8/28/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) Modified on 8/31/2020 (eg). (Entered: 08/29/2020)
2020-08-31NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 7 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with correct documents for party served. (eg) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-318NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD F. WOLF (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-09-089RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/08/2020. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-0810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar