Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWaterWatch of Oregon v. U.S. Bureau of Reclamation
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2020cv01445
Date Filed2020-08-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Marco A. Hernandez
PlaintiffWaterWatch of Oregon
Case DescriptionWaterwatch Oregon submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Bureau of Reclamation for records concerning the agency's management of stored water in Bowman Reservoir. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WaterWatch Oregon filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Bureau of Reclamation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-251Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7151014 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by WaterWatch of Oregon against U.S. Bureau of Reclamation (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Rule, Lauren) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-272Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 12/28/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/25/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/25/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (rs) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
2020-08-273Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar