Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2020cv02588
Date Filed2020-08-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Services for records concerning permit applications, permits, and related records pertaining to import or re-export of queen conch. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Fish and Wildlife Service an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-261COMPLAINT For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief against United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7455735)Attorney Courtney Renee McVean added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Requested Upon The Attorney General, # 3 Summons Requested Upon U.S. FWS, # 4 Summons Requested Upon The U.S. Attorney)(McVean, Courtney) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-262Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-263SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-09-214NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Logan Ann Steiner on behalf of United States Fish and Wildlife ServiceAttorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party United States Fish and Wildlife Service(pty:dft) (Steiner, Logan) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-215NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer E. Best on behalf of Friends of AnimalsAttorney Jennifer E. Best added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla) (Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-216STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint (Joint) by Defendant United States Fish and Wildlife Service. United States Fish and Wildlife Service answer due 10/21/2020. (Steiner, Logan) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-297MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(McVean, Courtney) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-308SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of Animals. United States Fish and Wildlife Service served on 9/1/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Best, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-309ORDER granting 7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Courtney R. McVean is relieved of any further representation of Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate Attorney McVean as counsel of record, and to remove this name from the electronic certificate of mailing. Plaintiff shall continue to be represented by Attorney Jennifer E. Best. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/30/2020. Text Only Entry(klmlc2, ) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-1310MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3-3] is November 9, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/13/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-1311MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/13/20 Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference. Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-1912Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint, by Defendant United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Steiner, Logan) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-1913MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/19/20 GRANTING 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. United States Fish and Wildlife Service answer due 11/12/2020. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar